CA AB1563 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 831, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 831, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12172.8 to the Government Code, and to add Section 529.6 to the Penal Code, relating to the census.
Title
Census: interference with the census: California Census Bill of Rights and Responsibilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-13 - Assembly - AB 1563 Santiago Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-12 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1563 Santiago et al. By Umberg (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 1563 Santiago Assembly Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 4 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-12 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1563 Santiago et al. By Umberg (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 1563 Santiago Assembly Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 4 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 831, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 3544.). |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (September 12). |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3439.) |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3370.) |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 2. Page 2761.). |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30). |
2019-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 9). |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-06-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and PUB. S. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 4. Page 1569.) |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (April 30). |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12172.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 529.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |