CA AB1569 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 6377 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Sales and use tax: medicinal cannabis: veterans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2020-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing for testimony only. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a). |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 6377 | New Code | See Bill Text |