CA AB1575 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 19139 to the Government Code, relating to personal services contracts.
Title
Personal services contracts: reports and termination of contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-20 - Assembly - AB 1575 PAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1575 Pan By Cannella (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Assembly - AB 1575 PAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1575 Pan By Cannella (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Assembly - AB 1575 PAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-30 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2014-09-03 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-20 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 5. Page 6212.). |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 4. Page 4552.). |
2014-08-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2014-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 2. Page 4471.) |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (April 9). |
2014-03-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-03-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 12). |
2014-02-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2014-01-31 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 2. |
2014-01-30 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 19139 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Contract Code | 10377 | New Code | See Bill Text |