CA AB1593 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-27 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
Pending: Senate Governance and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-27 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
Pending: Senate Governance and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 17052 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Personal income taxes: earned income credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Assembly - AB 1593 Reyes Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 18 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-27 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-07-01 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 18. Page 1984.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 16). |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing for testimony only. |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17052 | Amended Code | Citation Text |