CA AB1596 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 572, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 572, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 527.6, 527.8, 527.10, 527.85, and 527.9 of the Code of Civil Procedure, to amend Sections 241, 242, 243, 244, 245, 246, 6304, 6320, 6320.5, 6322.7, 6345, 6380, 6384, 6387, and 6389 of, to add Section 6229 to, and to repeal and add Section 6302 of, the Family Code, to amend Section 6103.2 of the Government Code, and to amend Sections 213.5, 15657.03, and 15657.04 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to protective orders.
Title
Protective orders: enforcement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-19 - Assembly - AB 1596 HAYASHI Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-18 - Senate - Special Consent #31 AB1596 Hayashi By Hancock (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-08 - Assembly - AB 1596 HAYASHI Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-18 - Senate - Special Consent #31 AB1596 Hayashi By Hancock (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-08 - Assembly - AB 1596 HAYASHI Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 572, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2010-08-26 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:45 p.m. | |
2010-08-19 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6373.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6380.) | |
2010-08-18 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2010-08-18 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4604.) | |
2010-08-12 | Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. | |
2010-08-09 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-05 | Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2010-08-03 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-02 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2010-06-24 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-06-23 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 22). From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2010-05-27 | Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and PUB. S. | |
2010-05-20 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2010-05-19 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2010-04-29 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2010-04-08 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-04-08 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4547.) | |
2010-04-05 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-03-25 | Withdrawn from committee. To second reading. | |
2010-03-24 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-03-23 | Read second time and amended. | |
2010-03-22 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 16). | |
2010-03-08 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2010-03-04 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-03-01 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2010-01-14 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2010-01-05 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 4. | |
2010-01-04 | Read first time. To print. |