CA AB1596 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-14 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-14 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal and amend Sections 17053.80 and 23623 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Income taxes: credits: hiring full-time employees.
Sponsors
Asm. Paul Cook [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-14 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |
2012-04-09 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. | |
2012-02-17 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |
2012-02-07 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 8. | |
2012-02-06 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053.80 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23623 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1596&sess=1112&house=A |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1551-1600/ab_1596_bill_20120206_introduced.html |