CA AB1596 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-22 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hernandez.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-22 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hernandez.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 69.5 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Property taxation: base year value transfers.
Sponsors
Asm. Todd Gloria [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Assembly - AB 1596 GLORIA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Assembly - AB 1596 GLORIA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-22 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hernandez. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 11). |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3868.) |
2018-01-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-01-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 18). |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (January 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 53398.79 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 69.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |