CA AB1597 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 16642 of, and to add and repeal Section 7513.76 of, the Government Code, relating to public employee retirement systems.
Title
Public employee retirement systems: prohibited investments: Turkey.
Sponsors
Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D] | Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D] | Sen. Anthony Portantino [D] | Sen. Scott Wilk [R] |
Asm. Travis Allen [R] | Asm. Phillip Chen [R] | Asm. Laura Friedman [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1597 NAZARIAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1597 Nazarian et al. By Portantino (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1597 NAZARIAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1597 Nazarian et al. By Portantino (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1597 NAZARIAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-30 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2018-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2018-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5946.). |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-07-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2018-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and JUD. |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-06-11 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2017-07-10 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 2060.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 26). |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 16642 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 7513.76 | New Code | See Bill Text |