CA AB1609 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 878, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 878, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 11106, 16520, 27590, 27600, 27875, 27920, and 28230 of, and to add Section 27585 to, the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms.
Sponsors
Asm. Luis Alejo [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-28 - Assembly - AB 1609 ALEJO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 49 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1609 Alejo By Wolk (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1609 ALEJO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1609 Alejo By Wolk (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1609 ALEJO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 878, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2014-08-28 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 24. Page 6646.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6656.). |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 11. Page 4892.). |
2014-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-19 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 4). |
2014-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-17 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 25. Page 5222.) |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5088.) |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (April 9). |
2014-03-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-02-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-02-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 9. |
2014-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 11106 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 16520 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 27585 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 27590 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 27600 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 27875 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 27920 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 28230 | Amended Code | Citation Text |