CA AB161 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-30 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-30 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 5.8 (commencing with Section 42359) to Part 3 of Division 30 of the Public Resources Code, relating to solid waste.
Title
Solid waste: paper waste: proofs of purchase.
Sponsors
Asm. Philip Ting [D] | Sen. Henry Stern [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] | Asm. Mark Stone [D] |
Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 161 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 24 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 161 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 24 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-30 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2019-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 25). |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and EQ. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 43. Noes 24. Page 1891.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-17 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-05-17 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 7.) (May 16). |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1760.) |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.) |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (April 23). |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (March 25). |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-01-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 7. |
2019-01-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 42359 | New Code | See Bill Text |