CA AB1611 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1317.2a of, and to add Sections 1317.11, 1317.12, 1371.6, 1371.7, and 1385.035 to, the Health and Safety Code, and to add Sections 10112.91, 10112.92, and 10181.35 to the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency hospital services: costs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1611 Chiu Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 9 NV: 23 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-10SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-06-27SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-06-12SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 9. Page 2157.)
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 16).
2019-05-16AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1760.)
2019-05-15AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-05-13AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.)
2019-04-30AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-29AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2019-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 23).
2019-04-23AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-04-22AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-14AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code1317.11New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code1317.12New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code1317.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1371.6New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code1371.7New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code1385.035New CodeSee Bill Text
Insurance Code10112.91New CodeSee Bill Text
Insurance Code10112.92New CodeSee Bill Text
Insurance Code10181.35New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback