CA AB162 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-27 - Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 34. Noes 11. Page 3912.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-27 - Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 34. Noes 11. Page 3912.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 283 and 431.5 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to communications.
Title
Communications: universal service programs: Public Utilities Commission reimbursement fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-27 - Assembly - AB 162 Kiley Assembly Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 11 NV: 35 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 162 Kiley Assembly Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 16 NV: 27 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 162 Kiley Assembly Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 16 NV: 27 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 34. Noes 11. Page 3912.). |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | Reconsideration granted. (Page 3887.) |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | January 23-Motion to reconsider continued. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Motion to reconsider on the next legislative day made by Assembly Member Kiley. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 37. Noes 16. Page 1594.). |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on C. & C. |
2019-01-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 7. |
2019-01-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 283 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 431.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |