CA AB1627 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 30165.1 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to cigarettes, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Cigarette Tobacco Directory.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-27 - Assembly - AB 1627 Robert Rivas Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 15 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 15. Page 3909.) |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (January 23). |
2020-01-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-01-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (January 8). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and JUD. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 30165.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |