CA AB1635 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Referred to Com. on G.O.
Pending: Senate Governmental Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Referred to Com. on G.O.
Pending: Senate Governmental Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 19596.2 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to horse racing.
Title
Horse racing: out-of-state thoroughbred races: Pegasus World Cup Invitational.
Sponsors
Asm. Adam Gray [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-21 - Assembly - AB 1635 Gray Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-01-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 3848.) |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (January 8). |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 19596.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |