CA AB1637 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 801, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 801, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Article 4.5 (commencing with Section 34340) of Chapter 1 of Part 2 of Division 24 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing.
Title
City of San Diego: County of Santa Clara: housing authority: middle-income housing projects.
Sponsors
Asm. Todd Gloria [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-14 - Assembly - AB 1637 GLORIA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1637 Gloria By Atkins (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-18 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1637 GLORIA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1637 Gloria By Atkins (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-18 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1637 GLORIA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-14 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 801, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-14 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3387.). |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Page 3254.) |
2017-09-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2704.). |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-08-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2017-07-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-07-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 18). |
2017-07-10 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1655.) |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 10). |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65915 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 34335 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 34340 | New Code | See Bill Text |