CA AB1639 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-21 - To inactive file on motion of Assembly Member Charles Calderon.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-21 - To inactive file on motion of Assembly Member Charles Calderon.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2923.5 of, and to add Article 1.7 (commencing with Section 2946) to Chapter 2 of Title 14 of Part 4 of Division 3 of, the Civil Code, relating to mortgages.
Title
Facilitated Mortgage Workout Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-03 - Assembly - AB 1639 NAVA Assembly Third Reading Motion to Reconsider By CALDERON (Y: 42 N: 24 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-03 - Assembly - AB 1639 NAVA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 31 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary. (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-08 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Judiciary. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-03 - Assembly - AB 1639 NAVA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 31 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary. (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-08 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Judiciary. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-21 | To inactive file on motion of Assembly Member Charles Calderon. | |
2010-06-03 | Read third time, passage refused. (Ayes 38. Noes 31. Page 5587.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Charles Calderon. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 42. Noes 24. Page 5588.) | |
2010-06-01 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-05-28 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |
2010-05-05 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2010-04-22 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 22). | |
2010-04-20 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 5.) (April 19). | |
2010-04-19 | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4712.) Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4712.) | |
2010-04-13 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. | |
2010-04-12 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. by unanimous consent, and then be re-referred to Com. on JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-04-08 | From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and B. & F. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 8). | |
2010-04-05 | Re-referred to Com. on RULES by unanimous consent. | |
2010-03-16 | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |
2010-03-15 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-01-21 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |
2010-01-12 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 11. | |
2010-01-11 | Read first time. To print. |