CA AB1650 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 880, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 880, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 10186 to the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts.
Title
Public contracts: bidders: employment practices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-26 - Assembly - AB 1650 JONES-SAWYER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 56 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1650 Jones-Sawyer By Jackson (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1650 JONES-SAWYER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1650 Jones-Sawyer By Jackson (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1650 JONES-SAWYER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 880, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-26 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 21. Page 6446.). |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 23 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 10. Page 4728.). |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and JUD. |
2014-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 21. Page 5325.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 16. Page 5346.) |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5220.) |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-04-09 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 25). |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-02-12 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. |
2014-02-11 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Contract Code | 10186 | New Code | See Bill Text |