CA AB1657 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 271, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 25232 to the Public Resources Code, relating to public resources.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Energy Resources Conservation and Development Commission: Blue Ribbon Commission on Lithium Extraction in California: report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1657 GARCIA, E. Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1657 Eduardo Garcia By Hueso (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1657 Eduardo Garcia Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-29 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 271, Statutes of 2020.
2020-09-29 Approved by the Governor.
2020-09-14AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2020-08-31AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 70. Noes 0.).
2020-08-31AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended.
2020-08-31AssemblyFrom committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 31).
2020-08-31AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended.
2020-08-30AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on U. & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2020-08-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2020-08-30SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 4.).
2020-08-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-25SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2020-08-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 20).
2020-08-13SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2020-08-04SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-07-27SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2020-07-01SenateRe-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2020-06-04SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2020-06-04SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2020-06-03SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2019-07-01SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-06-12SenateReferred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2019-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2153.)
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16).
2019-05-01AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on W., P., & W.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code25232New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback