CA AB168 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 166, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 166, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 65400, 65913.4, and 65941.1 of the Government Code, relating to land use, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Planning and zoning: annual report: housing development: streamlined approvals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-01 - Assembly - AB 168 AGUIAR-CURRY Concurrence - Urgency Added (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB168 Aguiar-Curry et al. By Wieckowski Urgency Clause (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-06 - Senate - That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. Ordered to third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - AB 168 Aguiar-Curry Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB168 Aguiar-Curry et al. By Wieckowski Urgency Clause (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-06 - Senate - That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. Ordered to third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - AB 168 Aguiar-Curry Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 166, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-14 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2020-09-01 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 5523.). |
2020-09-01 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 5523.) |
2020-09-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-09-01 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-07 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-07 | Senate | From committee: That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 6) |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Wiener. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2019-07-01 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HOUSING, EQ. and GOV. & F. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1624.) |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 8. |
2019-01-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65400 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65913.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65941.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |