CA AB169 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 604, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 604, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 600.2 and 600.5 of the Penal Code, relating to guide, signal, and service dogs.
Title
Guide, signal, and service dogs: injury or death.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Lackey [R] | Asm. Steven Choi [R] | Asm. Devon Mathis [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-10 - Assembly - AB 169 Lackey Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-04 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB169 Lackey et al. By Wilk (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Assembly - AB 169 Lackey Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-04 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB169 Lackey et al. By Wilk (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Assembly - AB 169 Lackey Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 604, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-18 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3238.). |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2490.). |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-06-24 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 918.) |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 20). |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (February 26). |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 8. |
2019-01-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 600.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 600.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |