CA AB170 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 415, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 415, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2750.3 of the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Worker status: employees and independent contractors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-14 - Assembly - AB 170 Gonzalez Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 66 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB170 Gonzalez et al. By Mitchell (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB170 Gonzalez By Durazo Reconsider (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB170 Gonzalez By Durazo (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - AB 170 Gonzalez Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 17 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB170 Gonzalez et al. By Mitchell (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB170 Gonzalez By Durazo Reconsider (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB170 Gonzalez By Durazo (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - AB 170 Gonzalez Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 17 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 415, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-17 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. |
2019-09-14 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 66. Noes 6. Page 3607.). |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (September 13). |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3575.) |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2019-09-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 2934.). |
2019-09-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-12 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-09-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (September 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Joint Rules 61 and 62 suspended. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 2757.) |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2458.) |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 19. Noes 13. Page 2458.). |
2019-08-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-26 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-08-21 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. |
2019-08-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-20 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-07-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (July 2). |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 12). |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 17. Page 1250.) |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (March 26). |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (March 6). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD. |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 8. |
2019-01-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 2750.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |