CA AB1710 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 855, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 855, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1798.81.5, 1798.82, and 1798.85 of the Civil Code, relating to personal information privacy.
Title
Personal information: privacy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-25 - Assembly - AB 1710 DICKINSON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 50 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1710 Dickinson By Monning (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Assembly - AB 1710 DICKINSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Banking and Finance (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1710 Dickinson By Monning (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Assembly - AB 1710 DICKINSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Banking and Finance (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 855, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 6392.). |
2014-08-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Action rescinded whereby the bill was re-referred to Com. on B. & F. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Ordered to the unfinished business file. |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 23 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 10. Page 4715.). |
2014-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-19 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 24). |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 43. Noes 25. Page 5201.) |
2014-05-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (May 5). |
2014-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2014-04-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and B. & F. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2014-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1724.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 1724.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 1798.81.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1798.82 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1798.84 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1798.85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |