CA AB1718 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 592, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 592, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal Section 53.5 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Property taxation: leach pads, tailing facilities, and settling ponds: base year value: separate appraisal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-13 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1718 REV. & TAX (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 1718 REV. & TAX. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 1718 REV. & TAX. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 592, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-20 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-07-18 | Senate | In Senate. Held at Desk. |
2017-07-17 | Assembly | Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-07-17 | Assembly | Withdrawn from Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2017-07-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2017-07-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2022.). |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-07-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 5). |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 1621.) |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 8). |
2017-03-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2017-03-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 16. |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 53.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |