CA AB173 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 52050.7 and 52052.3 to the Education Code, relating to school accountability.
Title
Low-performing schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-02 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2010-01-31 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |
2009-05-28 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |
2009-05-13 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2009-04-30 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 29). | |
2009-04-15 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2009-04-14 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-04-13 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2009-01-30 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 1. | |
2009-01-29 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 52050.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 52052.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |