CA AB173 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 70, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 70, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 354.4 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to Armenian Genocide, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Armenian Genocide victims.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB173 Gatto By Liu (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - Assembly - AB 173 GATTO Third Reading Urgency (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - Assembly - AB 173 GATTO Third Reading Urgency (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 70, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-07-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-06-27 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |
2011-06-23 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |
2011-06-23 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1534.). | |
2011-06-15 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-06-14 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 14). | |
2011-05-12 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-04-14 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-04-14 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 0. Page 973.). | |
2011-03-31 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Measure version as amended on March 30 corrected. | |
2011-03-30 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-03-29 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 22). | |
2011-03-15 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-02-03 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-01-21 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 20. | |
2011-01-20 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 354.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |