CA AB173 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 262, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 262, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 14838.64 to the Government Code, and to add Sections 10508.5 and 20651.2 to the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts.
Title
Postsecondary education: Small Business Procurement and
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB173 Weber By Galgiani (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Governmental Organization (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Assembly - AB 173 WEBER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Governmental Organization (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Assembly - AB 173 WEBER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 262, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-09-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-08-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:15 p.m. |
2013-08-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2013-08-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 1890.). |
2013-08-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2013-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and G.O. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 13. Page 1653.) |
2013-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1562.) |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 15). |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2013-05-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2013-04-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2013-04-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended. |
2013-02-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2013-01-25 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 24. |
2013-01-24 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 14838.60 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 14838.64 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Contract Code | 10508.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Contract Code | 20651.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |