CA AB1752 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 500, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 500, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 31049.1 of the Water Code, relating to local government.
Title
South Coast Water District.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-13 - Assembly - AB 1752 Petrie-Norris Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-12 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-22 - Senate - Special Consent AB1752 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 1752 Kalra Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-12 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-22 - Senate - Special Consent AB1752 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 1752 Kalra Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-03 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 500, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-03 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3534.). |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (September 12). |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3439.) |
2019-08-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2019-08-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-08-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2244.). |
2019-08-19 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 10). |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Umberg. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 4). |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1588.) |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 31049.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |