CA AB1753 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 479, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 479, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 11161.5, 11162.1, and 11165 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to controlled substances.
Title
Controlled substances: CURES database.
Sponsors
Asm. Evan Low [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-30 - Assembly - AB 1753 LOW Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1753 Low By Bates (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1753 LOW Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1753 Low By Bates (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1753 LOW Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 479, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6989.). |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2018-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5973.). |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and PUB. S. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5387.) |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25). |
2018-05-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-01-16 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and PUB. S. |
2018-01-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 3. |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 11161.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11162.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11165 | Amended Code | Citation Text |