CA AB1782 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-20 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-20 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Title 4.5 (commencing with Section 1924) to Part 4 of Division 3 of the Civil Code, to add Chapter 5 (commencing with Section 104000) to Part 2 of Division 102 of the Health and Safety Code, and to add Part 6 (commencing with Section 22360) to Division 2 of the Public Contract Code, relating to personal information.
Title
Personal information: contact tracing.
Sponsors
Asm. Edwin Chau [D] | Asm. Buffy Wicks [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1782 Chau Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 18 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1782 Chau Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 18 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-20 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2020-08-19 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-08-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-08-11 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-07-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-07-09 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 18. Page 2121.) |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1983.) |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69 suspended. (Page 1982.) |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 8). |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 23). |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 9). |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and P. & C.P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a). |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and JUD. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1924 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 104000 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Contract Code | 22360 | New Code | See Bill Text |