CA AB1784 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-01 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Elections and Constitutional Amendments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-01 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Elections and Constitutional Amendments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 6 (commencing with Section 19500) to Division 19 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Elections: open-source paper ballot voting systems.
Sponsors
Asm. David Chiu [D] | Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D] | Asm. Miguel Santiago [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Sen. Jerry Hill [D] | Asm. Kevin Mullin [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1784 Santiago Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 12 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-25 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 12. Page 2123.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 16). |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 19500 | New Code | See Bill Text |