CA AB179 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 796, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 796, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 3010, 3050.5, 3065, 3066, 11713.3, 11713.13, and 11726 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 3050, 3050.1, and 3050.7 of, to add Sections 3065.2, 3065.25, 3065.3, and 3065.4 to, to add and repeal Article 6 (commencing with Section 3085) of Chapter 6 of Division 2 of, and to repeal Article 3 (commencing with Section 3052) of Chapter 6 of Division 2 of, the Vehicle Code, relating to new motor vehicles.
Title
New Motor Vehicle Board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-05 - Assembly - AB 179 Reyes Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB179 Reyes By Jones (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Assembly - AB 179 Reyes Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB179 Reyes By Jones (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Assembly - AB 179 Reyes Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 796, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3012.). |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2453.). |
2019-08-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-26 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and JUD. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2012.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1722.) |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | From Consent Calendar. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-01-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 9. |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 11713.13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 11713.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 11726 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 3010 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 3050 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 3050.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 3050.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 3050.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 3065 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 3066 | New Code | See Bill Text |