CA AB180 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 97008, 97009, 97010, 97011, 97012, 97013, and 97015 of, and to amend the heading of Title 15.8 (commencing with Section 97008) of, the Government Code, relating to corrections.
Title
Institutional and community corrections: Smart Justice Student Program.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Gipson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2020-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-01-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 9. |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 97008 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 97009 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 97010 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 97011 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 97012 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 97013 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 97015 | Amended Code | Citation Text |