CA AB1812 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-22 - Referred to Com. on INS.
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-22 - Referred to Com. on INS.
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2117 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to unemployment insurance, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Unemployment insurance: penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 1812 INS. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1588.) |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2019-03-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 5. |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Unemployment Insurance Code | 2117 | Amended Code | Citation Text |