CA AB1821 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 116, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 116, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1459.5 to the Civil Code, relating to contracts.
Title
Contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1821 JUD. (Stone) By Stern (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - AB 1821 JUD. Assembly Third Reading By STONE (Y: 59 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - AB 1821 JUD. Assembly Third Reading By STONE (Y: 59 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 116, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-07-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-07-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-07-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2019-07-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 1868.). |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 11). |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 17. Page 1350.) |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (April 9). |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 6. |
2019-03-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1459.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |