CA AB1839 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-23)
Status: Passed on September 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 413, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-23)
Status: Passed on September 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 413, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 23036 of, to add Sections 38.9, 17053.95, and 23695 to, and to repeal and amend Section 6902.5 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Income taxes: qualified motion pictures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-29 - Assembly - AB 1839 GATTO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Supp 2 AB1839 Gatto By De Le (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1839 GATTO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Revenue and Taxation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Supp 2 AB1839 Gatto By De Le (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1839 GATTO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Revenue and Taxation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 413, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 31 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6736.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6736.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 6738.). |
2014-08-29 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 2. Page 4993.). |
2014-08-27 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Page 4922.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-08-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-11 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-07-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2014-06-17 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5253.) |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5065.) From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-05-21 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-05-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-13 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. |
2014-03-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2014-03-20 | Assembly | Measure version as amended on March 19 corrected. Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. |
2014-03-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. and REV. & TAX. |
2014-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2014-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053.85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053.95 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23036 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23685 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23695 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 38.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |