CA AB1849 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 48205 of the Education Code, relating to pupil attendance.
Title
Pupil attendance: excused absences: mental or behavioral health.
Sponsors
Asm. Evan Low [D] | Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D] | Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Asm. Blanca Rubio [D] |
Asm. Autumn Burke [D] | Asm. Tyler Diep [R] | Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D] | Sen. Susan Eggman [D] |
Asm. Mike Gipson [D] | Asm. Todd Gloria [D] | Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D] | Asm. Kevin McCarty [D] |
Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-01-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2020-01-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 6. |
2020-01-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 48205 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB1849 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB1849 |