CA AB1850 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-01 - Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
Pending: Senate Labor, Public Employment and Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-01 - Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
Pending: Senate Labor, Public Employment and Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal and add Section 2750.3 of the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Worker classification: employees and independent contractors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-11 - Assembly - AB 1850 Gonzalez Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4822.) |
2020-06-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 3). |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-05-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2020-05-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2020-03-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2020-02-27 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2020-02-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2020-02-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2020-02-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2020-01-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 6. |
2020-01-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 2750.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |