CA AB1862 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 89700.2 to the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education.
Title
Public postsecondary education: California State University: tuition.
Sponsors
Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D] | Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D] | Asm. Miguel Santiago [D] |
Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-01-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 7. |
2020-01-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 89700.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB1862 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB1862 |