CA AB1933 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 33479.1, 33479.2, 33479.3, and 33479.5 of the Education Code, relating to pupil health.
Title
Pupil health: sudden cardiac arrest: athletic activities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2020-02-14 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD. |
2020-01-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 15. |
2020-01-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 33479.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 33479.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 33479.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 33479.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB1933 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB1933 |