CA AB1937 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 48852.5 of, and to add Sections 48851, 48852.6, and 48857 to, the Education Code, relating to homeless children and youths and unaccompanied youths, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Homeless children and youths and unaccompanied youths: reporting.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2020-03-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2020-01-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2020-01-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 16. |
2020-01-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 48851 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 48852.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 48852.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 48857 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB1937 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB1937 |