CA AB1938 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-19 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-19 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 14105.465 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to prescription drugs.
Title
Prescription drugs: 340B discount drug purchasing program.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Eggman [D] | Asm. Evan Low [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-11 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-01-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 16. |
2020-01-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14105.465 | New Code | See Bill Text |