CA AB1945 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
Pending: Senate Labor, Public Employment and Retirement Committee
Hearing: Aug 5 @ 1:30 pm in Senate Chamber
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 8562 to the Government Code, relating to emergency services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency services: first responders.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 1945 Salas Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2020-06-23SenateReferred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2020-06-09SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-06-08AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.)
2020-06-03AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 2).
2020-06-02AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2020-05-13AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-05-05AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on G.O.
2020-05-04AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
2020-01-30AssemblyReferred to Coms. on G.O. and P.E. & R.
2020-01-18AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 17.
2020-01-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code8562New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback