CA AB1948 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 13.5 of the Elections Code, and to amend Sections 27000.6 and 27000.7 of the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
Counties: officers: qualification for office.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1948 Mullin By DeSaulnier (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Assembly - AB 1948 MULLIN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Assembly - AB 1948 MULLIN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-30 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 9. Page 4494.). |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 23). |
2014-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2014-05-08 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4848.) |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 30). |
2014-04-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-07 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 2). |
2014-03-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2014-03-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2014-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2014-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 13.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 27000.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 27000.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |