CA AB195 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-17 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-17 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 20001 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicle accidents: fleeing the scene of an accident.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-07 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [08-07-2020]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 195 Patterson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 195 Patterson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-17 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-08-07 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2019-06-26 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1858.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1760.) |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.) |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2019-01-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 10. |
2019-01-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 20001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |