CA AB1959 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - In committee: Hearing for testimony only.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - In committee: Hearing for testimony only.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2605, 2606, 4833.1, and 4985.3 of, and to add Section 2606.5 to, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Property taxation: assessment appeals: deferral of tax payment.
Sponsors
Asm. Chad Mayes [I] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing for testimony only. |
2020-02-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2020-02-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2020-02-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2020-01-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 21. |
2020-01-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 2605 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 2606 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 2606.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 4833.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 4985.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB1959 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB1959 |