CA AB1969 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-30 - Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 7. Page 5382.).
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 21628 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to secondhand goods.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Secondhand goods: tangible personal property: reporting requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-30 - Assembly - AB 1969 Blanca Rubio Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 56 N: 7 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1969 Blanca Rubio et al. By Rubio (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Assembly - AB 1969 Blanca Rubio Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 14 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-30 Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 7. Page 5382.).
2020-09-27 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 185, Statutes of 2020.
2020-09-27 Approved by the Governor.
2020-09-10AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
2020-08-30AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
2020-08-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2020-08-30SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 7.).
2020-08-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-25SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2020-08-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 20).
2020-08-13SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2020-08-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-07-01SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2020-06-16SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-06-15AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 14. Page 4855.)
2020-06-10AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4746.)
2020-06-04AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (June 3).
2020-06-02AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2020-05-22AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (May 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-02-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2020-01-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 21.
2020-01-21AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code21628Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback