CA AB1974 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 251, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 251, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 19440 and 19640 of, and to add Sections 19578.2, 19583.5, 19583.7, 19583.9, 19583.10, 19585, and 19620.3 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to horse racing, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Horse racing: welfare and safety of racehorses and jockeys.
Sponsors
Asm. Edwin Chau [D] | Asm. Adam Gray [D] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Sen. Susan Rubio [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - AB 1974 Gray Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1974 Gray et al. By Dodd (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 1974 Gray Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1974 Gray et al. By Dodd (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 1974 Gray Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 251, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5382.). |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.). |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 20). |
2020-08-19 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-08-07 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4782.) |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 3). |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-05-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (May 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. |
2020-04-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 22. |
2020-01-22 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 19440 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 19578.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 19583.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 19583.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 19583.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 19583.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 19585 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 19620.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 19640 | Amended Code | Citation Text |