CA AB2 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 509, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 509, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 76396.3 of the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education.
Title
Community colleges: California College Promise.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-10 - Assembly - AB 2 Santiago Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2 Santiago et al. By Portantino (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2 Santiago Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2 Santiago et al. By Portantino (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2 Santiago Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-04 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 509, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-04 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-18 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3290.). |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3252.) |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2697.). |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 2088.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 4.) (May 16). |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (March 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2019-01-30 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2019-01-17 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and APPR. |
2018-12-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 76396.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |