CA AB2037 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-29 - Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 4434.).
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-29 - Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 4434.).
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1255.1 and 1255.25 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to health facilities.
Title
Health facilities: notices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2037 Wicks Concurrence in Senate Amendments By BONTA (Y: 51 N: 12 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2037 Wicks et al. By Leyva (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 2037 Wicks Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 15 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2037 Wicks et al. By Leyva (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 2037 Wicks Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 15 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-29 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 4434.). | |
2020-09-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 95, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 51. Noes 12. Page 5385.). |
2020-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 12.). |
2020-08-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-13 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2020-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 15. Page 4685.) |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (June 2). |
2020-05-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2020-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (May 18). |
2020-05-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-05-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2020-03-16 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-02-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-02-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 5. |
2020-02-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1255.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1255.25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |