CA AB2043 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-29 - Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4432.).
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-29 - Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4432.).
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 6725 of the Labor Code, relating to employment, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Occupational safety and health: agricultural employers and employees: COVID-19 response.
Sponsors
Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D] | Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D] | Asm. Robert Rivas [D] | Asm. Ash Kalra [D] |
Asm. Eloise Reyes [D] | Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Sen. Susan Eggman [D] | Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2043 Robert Rivas Concurrence - Urgency Added (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2043 Robert Rivas et al. By Caballero Urgency Clause (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Assembly - AB 2043 Robert Rivas Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 15 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2043 Robert Rivas et al. By Caballero Urgency Clause (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Assembly - AB 2043 Robert Rivas Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 15 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-29 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4432.). | |
2020-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 212, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 5359.). |
2020-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0.). |
2020-08-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 20). |
2020-08-13 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-08-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (August 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-28 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2020-07-08 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 15. Page 4829.) |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4747.) |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 4.) (June 3). |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-05-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (May 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2020-05-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2020-03-16 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-02-14 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD. |
2020-02-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 5. |
2020-02-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 6725 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |